LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB405
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB405
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB405
Compare Versions
AB405 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB405 Amended June 27, 2013
AB405 Amended April 18, 2013
AB405 Amended April 10, 2013
AB405 Amended April 1, 2013
AB405 Amended March 14, 2013
AB405 Introduced February 15, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB405 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB405 Amended June 27, 2013
AB405 Amended April 18, 2013
AB405 Amended April 10, 2013
AB405 Amended April 1, 2013
AB405 Amended March 14, 2013
AB405 Introduced February 15, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare