06/11/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 7, Statutes of 2013. | |||
06/11/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 05/31/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:15 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2013 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 970.). | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 14). | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 884.) | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2013 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 2). | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2013 | Read first time. To print. |