California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB415 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/25/2013

 BILL NUMBER: AB 415AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 25, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 24, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 3, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Garcia FEBRUARY 15, 2013 An act to amend Section 2864 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to solar energy. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 415, as amended, Garcia. Solar energy: water heating. The Solar Water Heating and Efficiency Act of 2007 requires the Public Utilities Commission, in consultation with the State Energy Resources Conservation and Development Commission, to establish eligibility criteria for solar water heating systems receiving gas customer funded incentives under the act. The act requires the criteria to include eligibility requirements for residential solar water heating systems or solar collectors used in systems for multifamily residential, commercial, government, nonprofit, educational, or industrial water heating systems, as specified. This bill would revise those eligibility requirements to require the solar water heating systems or solar collectors be certified by accredited listing agencies in accordance with  specified standards,   standards adopted by the commission,  and would specify that the commission may adopt consensus solar standards applicable to products or systems as developed by accredited standards developers. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 2864 of the Public Utilities Code is amended to read: 2864. (a) The commission, in consultation with the Energy Commission and interested members of the public, shall establish eligibility criteria for solar water heating systems receiving gas customer funded incentives pursuant to this article. The criteria should specify and include all of the following: (1) Design, installation, and energy output or displacement standards. To be eligible for rebate funding, a residential solar water heating system shall be certified by an accredited listing agency in accordance with  SRCC Standard 300 or with an equivalent American National Standard.   standards adopted by the commission.  Solar collectors used in systems for multifamily residential, commercial, government, nonprofit, educational, or industrial water heating shall be certified by an accredited listing agency in accordance with  SRCC Standard 100, SRCC Standard 150, SRCC Standard 600, or with ISO 9806, ASHRAE 93, or equivalent.   standards adopted by the commission.  Energy output of collectors and systems shall be determined in accordance with procedures set forth by the listing agency, and shall be based on testing results from accredited testing laboratories. (2) Require that solar water heating system components are new and unused, and have not previously been placed in service in any other location or for any other application. (3) Require that solar water heating collectors have a warranty of not less than 10 years to protect against defects and undue degradation. (4) Require that solar water heating systems are in buildings or facilities connected to a natural gas utility's distribution system within the state. (5) Require that solar water heating systems have meters or other kWhth measuring devices in place to monitor and measure the system's performance and the quantity of energy generated or displaced by the system. The criteria shall require meters for systems with a capacity for displacing over 30 kWth. The criteria may require meters for systems with a capacity of 30 kWth or smaller. (6) Require that solar water heating systems are installed in conformity with the manufacturer's specifications and all applicable codes and standards. (b) Gas customer funded incentives shall not be made for a solar water heating system that does not meet the eligibility criteria. (c) The commission may adopt consensus solar standards applicable to products or systems as developed by accredited standards developers.