California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB415 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 7, 2013

Amended

Bill June 25, 2013
Bill April 24, 2013
Bill April 3, 2013