Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2014 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2014 | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2013 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2013 | Read first time. To print. |