Assembly
|
02/03/2014
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2014
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/06/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/05/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|