|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2645.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1859.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1520.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|