LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB447
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB447
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB447
Compare Versions
AB447 Chaptered September 23, 2013
AB447 Enrolled August 28, 2013
AB447 Amended August 12, 2013
AB447 Amended July 10, 2013
AB447 Amended June 25, 2013
AB447 Amended March 21, 2013
AB447 Introduced February 19, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB447 Chaptered September 23, 2013
AB447 Enrolled August 28, 2013
AB447 Amended August 12, 2013
AB447 Amended July 10, 2013
AB447 Amended June 25, 2013
AB447 Amended March 21, 2013
AB447 Introduced February 19, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare