LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB449
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB449
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB449
Compare Versions
AB449 Chaptered September 6, 2013
AB449 Enrolled August 27, 2013
AB449 Amended June 6, 2013
AB449 Amended April 25, 2013
AB449 Amended March 19, 2013
AB449 Introduced February 19, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB449 Chaptered September 6, 2013
AB449 Enrolled August 27, 2013
AB449 Amended June 6, 2013
AB449 Amended April 25, 2013
AB449 Amended March 19, 2013
AB449 Introduced February 19, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare