Senate | 08/30/2013 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2013 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2013 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). | ||
Senate | 06/13/2013 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 1789.) | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2013 | Read first time. To print. |