|
10/08/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 644, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 2771.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1986.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 1511.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|