LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB463
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB463
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB463
Action History
Assembly
02/03/2014
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Assembly
01/31/2014
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
Assembly
04/15/2013
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
02/28/2013
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
Assembly
02/20/2013
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
Assembly
02/19/2013
Read first time. To print.