California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB466 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2013

Amended

Bill August 29, 2013
Bill August 22, 2013
Bill March 14, 2013