|
04/09/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 10, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2014
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4282.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/25/2014
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/13/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after March 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2903.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2014
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, urgency clause adopted, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2014
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2014
|
Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after February 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2720.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 1669.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|