Assembly | 05/02/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2013 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2013 | From committee: With amendments, but without recommendation, and be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 29). | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and INS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/11/2013 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2013 | Read first time. To print. |