Assembly
|
02/03/2014
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2014
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|