|
02/18/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 1, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/10/2014
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3798.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after February 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2721.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1342.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|