Assembly
|
05/31/2013
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 1876.) Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 37. Page 1877.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 32. Noes 36. Page 1845.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Ammiano.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HEALTH. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|