|
07/16/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 125, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/11/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4253.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3726.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|