08/12/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 79, Statutes of 2013. | |||
08/12/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 08/01/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2013 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1601.). | ||
Senate | 06/05/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 4). | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 1109.) | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2013 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2013 | Read first time. To print. |