California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB500 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013