California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB508 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2013
Bill September 6, 2013

Amended

Bill June 17, 2013
Bill April 9, 2013