|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 702, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3034.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2178.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1577.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|