California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB524 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2013

Amended

Bill May 24, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013