|
10/12/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 769, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/12/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/25/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3195.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3207.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2305.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 1671.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/08/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|