California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB547 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 12, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2013

Amended

Bill June 19, 2013
Bill April 11, 2013