Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2014 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2013 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2013 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2013 | Read first time. To print. |