|
10/11/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 740, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 2774.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 1984.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 19. Page 1555.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1510.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|