Assembly
|
02/03/2014
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2014
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|