|
08/28/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 196, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 1859.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 19. Page 1456.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|