California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB584 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2013
Bill September 6, 2013

Amended

Bill June 27, 2013
Bill April 15, 2013
Bill April 2, 2013