LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB60
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB60
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB60
Compare Versions
AB60 Chaptered October 3, 2013
AB60 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB60 Amended September 12, 2013
AB60 Amended September 6, 2013
AB60 Amended September 3, 2013
AB60 Amended July 8, 2013
AB60 Amended May 24, 2013
AB60 Amended April 16, 2013
AB60 Introduced January 7, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB60 Chaptered October 3, 2013
AB60 Enrolled September 16, 2013
AB60 Amended September 12, 2013
AB60 Amended September 6, 2013
AB60 Amended September 3, 2013
AB60 Amended July 8, 2013
AB60 Amended May 24, 2013
AB60 Amended April 16, 2013
AB60 Introduced January 7, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare