Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 5. Page 2341.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 34. Page 1843.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|