10/13/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 786, Statutes of 2013. | |||
10/13/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 09/03/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/26/2013 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/26/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1979.). | ||
Senate | 08/14/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/13/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 12). | ||
Senate | 06/27/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1008.) | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/10/2013 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 10). | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Com. on INS. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | ||
Assembly | 02/20/2013 | Read first time. To print. |