California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB612 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Amended

Bill August 19, 2014
Bill July 2, 2014
Bill June 19, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill May 29, 2014
Bill March 19, 2013