|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 266, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 48. Noes 21. Page 2582.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 1859.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 916.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|