California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB634 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2014

Amended

Bill June 15, 2014
Bill June 10, 2014
Bill April 1, 2013