LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB643
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB643
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB643
Compare Versions
AB643 Chaptered August 12, 2013
AB643 Enrolled July 1, 2013
AB643 Amended June 19, 2013
AB643 Amended May 7, 2013
AB643 Amended April 25, 2013
AB643 Amended March 19, 2013
AB643 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB643 Chaptered August 12, 2013
AB643 Enrolled July 1, 2013
AB643 Amended June 19, 2013
AB643 Amended May 7, 2013
AB643 Amended April 25, 2013
AB643 Amended March 19, 2013
AB643 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare