Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2014 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 01/17/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2014 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (January 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 01/07/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 01/06/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2013 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HIGHER ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2013 | Read first time. To print. |