California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB647 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2013

Amended

Bill August 14, 2013
Bill June 26, 2013
Bill June 5, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013
Bill March 19, 2013