LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB650
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB650
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB650
Compare Versions
AB650 Chaptered October 7, 2013
AB650 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB650 Amended August 26, 2013
AB650 Amended August 15, 2013
AB650 Amended June 19, 2013
AB650 Amended June 4, 2013
AB650 Amended May 1, 2013
AB650 Amended March 20, 2013
AB650 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB650 Chaptered October 7, 2013
AB650 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB650 Amended August 26, 2013
AB650 Amended August 15, 2013
AB650 Amended June 19, 2013
AB650 Amended June 4, 2013
AB650 Amended May 1, 2013
AB650 Amended March 20, 2013
AB650 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare