|
10/13/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 787, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 32. Page 3108.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 2266.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 32. Page 1320.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|