|
10/03/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 503, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2176.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1477.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|