Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2013
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 31. Page 1676.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|