Senate | 08/30/2013 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2013 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/18/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 18. Page 1333.) | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2013 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2013 | Read first time. To print. |