|
06/24/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 1272.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1006.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|