Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1753.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|