BILL NUMBER: AB 686AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 24, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 7, 2013 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 19, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Quirk FEBRUARY 21, 2013 An act to add and repeal Section 25201.18 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 686, as amended, Quirk. Hazardous waste: pharmaceutical facilities. Existing law requires hazardous waste facilities, including, but not limited to, treatment facilities, to operate under hazardous waste facilities permits or other grants of authorization issued by the Department of Toxic Substances Control. Existing law exempts pharmaceutical neutralization activities from certain requirements of the hazardous waste control laws and certain regulations adopted pursuant to that law if specified conditions are met with regard to the pharmaceutical manufacturing or process development activities, including the management of air emissions and wastes generated as a result of those activities. This bill would require the department, by January 1,20152016 , to develop recommendations for standards and guidelines for the operation of onsite waste management and recycling of hazardous waste at facilities engaged in pharmaceutical manufacturing or pharmaceutical process development. The department would be required, by January 1,20152016 , to submit a report to the Legislature on those recommendations, including any recommended statutory and regulatory actions needed to assure the safe and efficient management of waste from pharmaceutical manufacturing or pharmaceutical process developmentactivesactivities . The bill would repeal this report requirement on January 1, 2019. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 25201.18 is added to the Health and Safety Code, to read: 25201.18. (a) On or before January 1,20152016 , the department shall develop recommendations for standards and guidelines for the operation of onsite hazardous waste management and recycling activities at facilities engaged in pharmaceutical manufacturing or pharmaceutical process development. The recommendations shall consider, but are not limited to, all of the following: (1) Actions to reduce the production and offsite disposal of hazardous waste from pharmaceutical manufacturing operations. (2) Actions to provide incentives to reduce greenhouse gas emissions through increased energy efficiency. (3) Recommended permit conditions or other requirements for onsite waste management within a pharmaceutical manufacturing facility to ensure the protection of public health and the environment and that recognize the unique federal and state requirements that apply to pharmaceutical manufacturing. (b) On or before January 1,20152016 , the department shall submit a report to the Legislature in compliance with Section 9795 of the Government Code on the recommendations developed pursuant to subdivision (a), including any recommended statutory and regulatory actions needed to assure the safe and efficient management of hazardous waste from pharmaceutical manufacturing or pharmaceutical process development activities. (c) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019, pursuant to Section 10231.5 of the Government Code and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2019, deletes or extends that date.