08/19/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 126, Statutes of 2013. | |||
08/19/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 08/12/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:40 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2013 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/08/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1688.). | ||
Senate | 06/12/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 11). | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1475.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2013 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 7). | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2013 | Read first time. To print. |