LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB703
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB703
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB703
Compare Versions
AB703 Chaptered September 9, 2013
AB703 Enrolled August 27, 2013
AB703 Amended June 25, 2013
AB703 Amended May 8, 2013
AB703 Amended April 2, 2013
AB703 Amended March 20, 2013
AB703 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB703 Chaptered September 9, 2013
AB703 Enrolled August 27, 2013
AB703 Amended June 25, 2013
AB703 Amended May 8, 2013
AB703 Amended April 2, 2013
AB703 Amended March 20, 2013
AB703 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare